No. | Name | Period | Vice President |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Rajendra Prasad | 26 January 1950 to 12 May 1962 | Sarvepalli Radhakrishnan |
2 | Sarvepalli Radhakrishnan | 13 May 1962 to 13 May 1967 | Zakir Husain |
3 | Zakir Husain | 13 May 1967 to 3 May 1969 | Varahagiri Venkata Giri |
- | Varahagiri Venkata Giri * | 3 May 1969 to 20 July 1969 | -- |
- | Mohammad Hidayatullah * | 20 July 1969 to 24 August 1969 | -- |
4 | Varahagiri Venkata Giri | 24 August 1969 to 24 August 1974 | Gopal Swarup Pathak |
5 | Fakhruddin Ali Ahmed | 24 August 1974 to 11 February 1977 | Basappa Danappa Jatti |
- | Basappa Danappa Jatti * | 11 February 1977 to 25 July 1977 | -- |
6 | Neelam Sanjiva Reddy | 25 July 1977 to 25 July 1982 | Basappa Danappa Jatti Muhammad Hidayatullah |
7 | Giani Zail Singh | 25 July 1982 to 25 July 1987 | Muhammad Hidayatullah Ramaswamy Venkataraman |
8 | Ramaswamy Venkataraman | 25 July 1987 to 25 July 1992 | Shankar Dayal Sharma | 9 | Shankar Dayal Sharma | 25 July 1992 to 25 July 1997 | Kocheril Raman Narayanan | 10 | Kocheril Raman Narayanan | 25 July 1997 to 25 July 2002 | Krishan Kant | 11 | A. P. J. Abdul Kalam | 25 July 2002 to 25 July 2007 | Krishan Kant Bhairon Singh Shekhawat |
12 | Pratibha Patil | 25 July 2007 to 25 July 2012 | Mohammad Hamid Ansari | 13 | Pranab Mukherjee | 25 July 2012 to 25 July 2017 | Mohammad Hamid Ansari | 14 | Ram Nath Kovind | 25 July 2017 to Incumbent | M. Venkaiah Naidu |
Missiles Mock Test | Start Test! |
SSC MTS Mock Test | Start Test |
IBPS CLERK MOCK TEST | Start Test |
SSC MTS 2022 JULY 26 Shift 1 (ENGLISH) | Start Test! |
SSC GD Previous Year Paper 2021 Nov 17 Shift - I (Hindi) | Start Test! |
SSC CGL Tier - 1 PYP 2022 April 21 Shift- 1 (ENGLISH) | Start Test! |
MPSC PAPER I MOCK TEST 1 (ENGLISH) | Start Test! |
IB Security Assistant Mock test 1 (english) | Start Test! |
UP POLICE CONSTABLE MOCK TEST 1 | Start Test! |
DELHI POLICE CONSTABLE MOCK TEST 1 (HINDI) | Start Test! |